Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo dei Conti Fabiani

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1816Born
30 Nov 183923.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Dec 183923.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187255.6AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
10 Mar 187255.6Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
17 May 188063.8DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo dei Conti Fabiani
Bishop Paolo dei Conti Fabiani (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGubbio, Diocese of Gubbio

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 126
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 45
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,765

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast