Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioan Maria Duma, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Iuliopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1896Born
16 Nov 194852.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
8 Dec 194852.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
16 Jul 198184.6DiedTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis

MicroData Summary for Ioan Maria Duma
Bishop Ioan Maria Duma O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Iuliopolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRomania

  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1948, Number 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast