Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico de Martino

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1844Born
9 Jun 190258.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
15 Jun 190258.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
20 Jun 190258.2AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
1907²62.7ResignedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
30 Nov 190864.6AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
26 Aug 190965.3DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Federico de Martino
Bishop Federico de Martino (born , died ) Bishop of Castellaneta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeta di Sorrento
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 169, and Page 302
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1902, Number 34
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,882

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast