Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Odon De Wilde, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1908Born
2 Aug 193123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Mar 194840.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Mar 194840.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tadamata
29 Jun 194840.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tadamata
10 Nov 195951.7AppointedBishop of Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Feb 197668.0DiedBishop of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for François-Odon De Wilde
Bishop François-Odon De Wilde O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Isiro-Niangara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWetteren, Belgium
Ordained BishopDominican, Church, Gand, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1948, Number 78
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 693

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast