Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luis Cardinal de Sousa

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1630Born
19 Jan 167140.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
14 Jun 167140.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
2 Dec 167545.1AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa, Portugal
22 Jul 169766.7Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jan 170271.2DiedArchbishop of Lisboa, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Luis de Sousa
Luis Cardinal de Sousa (born , died ) Archbishop of Lisboa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto, Diocese of Porto
Ordained BishopRoyal, Chapel, Lisboa, Archdiocese of Lisboa

  • a bishop for 30.5 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jul 1697
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,680
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 25
  • bd: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,198

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast