Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luís de Sousa

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626¹Born
15 Dec 167044.9AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
12 Jul 167145.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lamego, Portugal
8 Feb 167751.1AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
29 Apr 169064.3DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luís de Sousa
Archbishop Luís de Sousa (born 1626, died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 213
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 126, and Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast