Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo de Mascarenhas

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648¹Born
1 Apr 168638.2AppointedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
28 Jul 168638.5Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
24 Mar 169244.2AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
24 Jan 169345.0DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo de Mascarenhas
Bishop Joćo de Mascarenhas (born 1648, died ) Bishop of Guarda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 192, and Page 321
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 17
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,760

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast