Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Dell’Aquila

Deceased

Prelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy

Titular Bishop of Lystra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1873Born
27 Jun 193258.5AppointedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
27 Jun 193258.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
28 Aug 193258.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
12 Jul 194268.5DiedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Dell’Aquila
Bishop Domenico Dell’Aquila (born , died ) Prelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarletta

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast