Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Coudray, S.J.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mongo, Chad

Titular Bishop of Silli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1942 Born
30 Jun 197331.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Mar 198037.6Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
1 Dec 200159.4AppointedPrefect of Mongo, Chad
3 Jun 200966.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mongo, Chad
3 Jun 200966.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Silli
29 Nov 200967.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Silli
14 Dec 202078.4RetiredVicar Apostolic of Mongo, Chad

MicroData Summary for Henri Coudray
Bishop Henri Coudray S.J. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mongo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePont-de-Beauvoisin, France
Ordained BishopSaint-Ignace, Church, Mongo, Vicariate Apostolic of Mongo

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Mongo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,320
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Apr 2021

Quantcast