Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arturo de Jesús Correa Toro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ipiales, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1941Born
22 Oct 196726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Jericó, Colombia
29 Jan 200058.7AppointedBishop of Ipiales, Colombia
20 Mar 200058.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ipiales, Colombia
3 Feb 201876.7RetiredBishop of Ipiales, Colombia
26 May 202180.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Ipiales, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Arturo de Jesús Correa Toro
Bishop Arturo de Jesús Correa Toro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ipiales

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItuango
Ordained PriestMedellín, Archdiocese of Medellín
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de las Mercedes, Cathedral, Jericó, Diocese of Jericó
Death PlaceSan Pedro, Hospital, Pasto, Diocese of Pasto

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,719
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Feb 2018
  • opd/d: CB, 26 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 May 2021

Quantcast