Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benigno Chiriboga, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Latacunga, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1900Born
25 Aug 192929.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Nov 195858.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
15 Nov 195858.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Acalissus
21 Dec 195858.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acalissus
5 Dec 196363.3AppointedBishop of Latacunga, Ecuador
3 Dec 196868.3ResignedBishop of Latacunga, Ecuador
3 Dec 196868.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tasaccora
29 Nov 197070.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Tasaccora
9 Oct 198181.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Latacunga, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Benigno Chiriboga
Bishop Benigno Chiriboga S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Latacunga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiobamba
Ordained BishopCathedral, Quito, Archdiocese of Quito

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast