Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Chávez Alcazar

Deceased

Bishop of Oruro, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1893Born
1 Jan 192228.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 193844.8AppointedBishop of Oruro, Bolivia
6 Mar 193844.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oruro, Bolivia
30 Sep 194956.5DiedBishop of Oruro, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Chávez Alcazar
Bishop Ricardo Chávez Alcazar (born , died ) Bishop of Oruro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAspiazu
Ordained BishopSt. Francois, Church, Oruro, Diocese of Oruro

  • a priest for 27.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1950
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 19
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,761

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast