Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Castiglioni

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Famagusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1874Born
18 Dec 189723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Vigevano, Italy
1900²25.7IncardinatedPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
12 Jan 193762.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
12 Jan 193762.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
7 Feb 193762.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Famagusta
19 Mar 194368.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Castiglioni
Bishop Paolo Castiglioni (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOssona

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1937, Number 8
  • opd: CB, 13 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast