Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Castro y Ramírez

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de María, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1901Born
19 Dec 192524.2Ordained PriestPriest of San Salvador, El Salvador
15 Nov 195655.1AppointedBishop of Santiago de María, El Salvador
27 Jan 195755.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de María, El Salvador
29 May 197472.6DiedBishop of Santiago de María, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Castro y Ramírez
Bishop Francisco José Castro y Ramírez (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de María

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Salvador, Archdiocese of San Salvador
Ordained BishopCathedral, San Salvador, Archdiocese of San Salvador

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,845

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast