Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Castillo Albaráñez

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Oviedo, Spain

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia

Apostolic Administrator of Oviedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1663¹Born
5 Oct 171653.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
30 Nov 171653.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
19 Jan 171754.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Oviedo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Castillo Albaráñez
Bishop Francisco José Castillo Albaráñez (born 1663) Auxiliary Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuenca
Ordained BishopSt. Antoine de Padoue, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 348
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 34, Number 109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 29
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,520

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast