Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rocco Caliandro

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1872Born
28 Mar 191240.1AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
21 Apr 191240.2Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
14 Mar 192452.1DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rocco Caliandro
Bishop Rocco Caliandro (born , died ) Bishop of Termoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCeglie Messapica
Ordained BishopSaint Joachim, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceTermoli, Diocese of Termoli

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 Feb 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1912, Number 23
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,951

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast