Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Calai-Marioni

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Hesbon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1842Born
1872²29.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 191067.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hesbon
18 Dec 191068.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hesbon
19 Jun 192077.5DiedTitular Bishop of Hesbon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roberto Calai-Marioni (VIAF: 62798648)
Bishop Roberto Calai-Marioni (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Hesbon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGualdo Tadino, Italy
Ordained BishopSacro Cuore di Gesú al Castro Pretorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1910, Number 80
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,927

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast