Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael John Browne

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1895Born
20 Jun 192024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tuam, Ireland
6 Aug 193741.6AppointedBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
10 Oct 193741.8Ordained BishopBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
21 Jul 197680.5RetiredBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
23 Feb 198084.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Michael John Browne
Bishop Michael John Browne (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Galway and Kilmacduagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWestport

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1937, Number 62
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast