Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Morrisroe

Deceased

Bishop of Achonry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1869Born
2 Feb 189323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Achonry, Ireland
13 May 191142.2AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
3 Sep 191142.5Ordained BishopBishop of Achonry, Ireland
27 May 194677.2DiedBishop of Achonry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Morrisroe
Bishop Patrick Morrisroe (born , died ) Bishop of Achonry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharlestown

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 34
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast