Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ruggero Blundo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalý, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1801Born
24 Jun 182221.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Jun 182322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Feb 182422.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Mar 185856.7AppointedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
21 Mar 185856.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalý, Italy
18 Mar 188886.7DiedBishop of Cefalý, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ruggero Blundo
Bishop Ruggero Blundo O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Cefalý

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained BishopSan Paolo fuori le Mura, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 196
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1858, Number 15
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 40, Number 2,449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast