Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
15 Oct 1962 | Born | ||
29 Apr 1991 | 28.5 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines |
7 Apr 2004 | 41.4 | Incardinated | Priest of Sacramento, California, USA |
20 Apr 2024 | 61.5 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA |
20 Apr 2024 | 61.5 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Balecium |
31 May 2024 | 61.6 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Balecium |
(WikiData: Q125536450)
Father
Reynaldo B.
Bersabal
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop-Elect
of Sacramento
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Magsaysay, Misamis Oriental, Philippines |
Ordained Bishop | Blessed Sacrament, Cathedral, Sacramento, Diocese of Sacramento, California |
Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Sacramento.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 20 Apr 2024 |
✠