Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Bavona (Bavaona)

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Austria

Titular Archbishop of Pharsalus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1856Born
13 Jul 190145.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
13 Jul 190145.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
13 Jul 190145.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Peru
17 Jul 190145.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pharsalus
13 Nov 190650.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
2 Feb 191154.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
19 Jan 191255.6DiedApostolic Nuncio to Austria

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Bavona (Bavaona) (VIAF: 257515471)
Archbishop Alessandro Bavona (Bavaona) (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Austria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocca di Cambio, Diocese of L’Aquila, Italy
Death PlaceVienna, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1901, Number 49
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 49, and Page 70, and Page 71
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 80, and Page 113, and Page 204
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast