Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Antoine-Jean Bach, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Savannakhet, Laos

Titular Bishop of Tituli in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1932Born
27 Dec 195927.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
28 Jun 197138.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Savannakhet, Laos
28 Jun 197138.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tituli in Proconsulari
10 Oct 197139.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tituli in Proconsulari
10 Jul 197542.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Savannakhet, Laos
26 Jun 202087.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Savannakhet, Laos

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Antoine-Jean Bach
Bishop Pierre-Antoine-Jean Bach M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Savannakhet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCommercy, France
Death PlaceSt. Louis, Hospital, Bangkok, Archdiocese of Bangkok, Thailand

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 48.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • mn: JI, 1 Apr 2019
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 839

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 28 Jun 2020

Quantcast