Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Manuel Cardinal Arteaga y Betancourt

Deceased

Archbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1879Born
7 Dec 190222.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
17 Apr 190424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
1912¹32.0IncardinatedPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
26 Dec 194161.9AppointedArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
24 Feb 194262.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
18 Feb 194666.1Elevated to Cardinal
28 Feb 194666.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
20 Mar 196383.2DiedArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Arteaga y Betancourt
Manuel Cardinal Arteaga y Betancourt (born , died ) Archbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuerto Príncipe, Archdiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana
Ordained PriestCaracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Ordained BishopCathedral, La Habana, Archdiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana
Death PlaceSan Juan de Dios, Hospital, La Habana, Archdiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana
Buried Place (Original)Cristóbal Colón, Cemetery, La Habana, Archdiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
  • a cardinal for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 11
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast