Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rabban Al-Qas

Bishop of Dohuk (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1949 Born
1973²23.5Ordained PriestPriest of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
3 Dec 200152.4AppointedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
1 Feb 200252.5Ordained BishopBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
11 Jul 201364.0AppointedBishop of Amadiyah and Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
27 Jun 202070.9AppointedBishop of Dohuk (Chaldean), Iraq

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rabban Al-Qas
Bishop Rabban Al-Qas (born ) Bishop of Dohuk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKomane
Ordained BishopBaghdad

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dohuk (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,125
  • ab: CB, 28 Aug 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast