Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleksandar Alagović

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1760³Born
26 May 178322.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Dec 178423.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Oct 182968.8SelectedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
15 Mar 183069.2ConfirmedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
30 May 183069.4Ordained BishopBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
18 Mar 183776.2DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aleksandar Alagović (VIAF: 317087193)
Bishop Aleksandar Alagović (born , died ) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManiga
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kalocsa, Archdiocese of Kalocsa, Hungary

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 401
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 15
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,401

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast