Catholic-Hierarchy DC

József Cardinal Batthyány

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1727Born
9 May 175124.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Esztergom, Hungary
29 Jun 175124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
13 Jul 175932.4AppointedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
2 Dec 175932.8Ordained BishopBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
22 May 176033.3SelectedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
15 Dec 176033.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
20 May 177649.3AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
1 Jun 177851.3Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 178255.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
22 Oct 179972.7DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Batthyány (VIAF: 49309266)
József Cardinal Batthyány (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Church, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
  • a cardinal for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jun 1778
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 43
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,357
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 91, Number 7,698

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast