Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmond-Marie-Henri Abelé

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1925Born
21 Oct 195126.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 197247.3AppointedBishop of Monaco
15 Oct 197247.6Ordained BishopBishop of Monaco
1 Dec 198055.7AppointedBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
2 Jun 198762.2ResignedBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
27 Sep 201792.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France

MicroData Summary for Edmond-Marie-Henri Abelé
Bishop Edmond-Marie-Henri Abelé (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâlons-Sur-Marne, Diocese of Châlons
Ordained BishopSainte-Dévote, Cathedral, Monaco, Diocese of Monaco
Death PlaceCournanel, Diocese of Carcassonne et Narbonne
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Jérôme, Co-Cathedral, Digne, Diocese of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: AJ, 29 Sep 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast