Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emile Eid

Deceased

Vice President Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Oriental Canon Law

Titular Bishop of Sarepta dei Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1925BornMazraat-el-Dahre
6 May 195126.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
20 Dec 198257.7AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Oriental Canon Law
20 Dec 198257.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta dei Maroniti
23 Jan 198357.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta dei Maroniti
18 Oct 199065.5ResignedVice President of the Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Oriental Canon Law
30 Nov 200984.7DiedVice President Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Oriental Canon Law

MicroData Summary for Emile Eid
Bishop Emile Eid (born , died ) Vice President Emeritus of Revision of the Code of Oriental Canon Law

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 1 May 2016