Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Massimo Cardinal Massimi

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)

President of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law

President of the Pontifical Commission for the Redaction of the Code of Oriental Canon Law


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1877BornRoma
14 Apr 190023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
19 Feb 192446.8AppointedPro-Dean of the Roman Rota
1 May 192649.0AppointedDean of the Roman Rota
16 Dec 193558.6Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 193558.6ResignedDean of the Roman Rota
19 Dec 193558.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
17 Feb 193658.8AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Redaction of the Code of Oriental Canon Law
14 Mar 193961.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
18 Feb 194668.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
29 May 194669.1AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
6 Mar 195476.9DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Massimo Massimi
Massimo Cardinal Massimi (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a cardinal for 18.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1935

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 1 May 2016