Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Eugen Remigius Schwarz, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect of Bettiah, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1873Born
18 Jul 189421.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
189521.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1914¹40.8AppointedPrefect of Bettiah, India
Feb 191844.8DiedPrefect of Bettiah, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugen Remigius Schwarz
Father Eugen Remigius Schwarz O.F.M. Cap. (born , died Feb 1918) Prefect of Bettiah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSontheim, Germany

  • a priest for 23.0 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast