Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Aurelio Gianora, C.R.S.M.A. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Sikkim, India

Titular See: (Can. Reg. of S. Maurizio)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1908Born
23 Sep 193325.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 193728.6AppointedPrefect of Sikkim, India
8 Aug 196253.9ResignedPrefect of Sikkim, India
31 Dec 199587.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Sikkim, India

MicroData Summary for Aurelio Gianora
Father Aurelio Gianora C.R.S.M.A. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Sikkim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeontica, Switzerland

  • a priest for 62.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1962

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast