Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Nestor Julao Adalia

Apostolic Administrator of Calapan, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1955 Born
13 Nov 201863.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Calapan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Nestor Julao Adalia
Father Nestor Julao Adalia (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Calapan

Please contact the Father through the Vicariate Apostolic of Calapan.

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 13 Nov 2018
  • mn: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast