Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Fernand Martin, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Fort Jameson, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1897Born
192022.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
17 Dec 193740.2AppointedPrefect of Fort Jameson, Zambia
194648.3ResignedPrefect of Fort Jameson, Zambia
2 Jul 196466.8DiedPrefect Emeritus of Fort Jameson, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Fernand Martin
Father Fernand Martin M. Afr. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Fort Jameson

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Remy-les-Chimay, Belgium

  • a priest for 44.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast