Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Emilio Larquère, C.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Tierradentro, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1869Born
23 Jun 189526.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
16 Nov 191546.5AppointedPrefect of Arauca, Colombia
9 Nov 192354.4AppointedPrefect of Tierradentro, Colombia
3 Jul 194879.1DiedPrefect of Tierradentro, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Emilio Larquère
Father Emilio Larquère C.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Tierradentro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiviere, France
Death PlaceBelalcazar

  • a priest for 53.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • ab: CB, 7 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast