Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Zschokke

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Titular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1838Born
25 Jul 186123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
17 Nov 191072.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
17 Nov 191072.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
11 Dec 191072.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
23 Oct 192082.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Hermann Zschokke (VIAF: 46940090)
Bishop Hermann Zschokke (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBöhmisch-Leipa

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 78
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast