Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Dominicus (Michael Antonius) Chiavassa, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India

Titular Bishop of Assuras

Titular See: (Joannes Dominicus a S. Clara)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1710Born
6 Apr 172818.0ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
15 Jun 175646.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India
15 Jun 175646.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras
30 Nov 175747.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assuras
25 Jan 177261.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India

MicroData Summary for Joannes Dominicus (Michael Antonius) Chiavassa
Bishop Joannes Dominicus (Michael Antonius) Chiavassa O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRacconigi

  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 103, and Page 455
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast