Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin-Sulpice Zen-Ruffinen

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1765³BornLeuk
20 Mar 179024.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
3 Apr 179025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
25 May 181752.1SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
28 Jul 181752.3ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
12 Oct 181752.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
21 Dec 182055.7DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustin-Sulpice Zen-Ruffinen:
Bishop Augustin-Sulpice Zen-Ruffinen (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 340

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013