Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mateo de Sagade de Bugueyro

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605BornPontevedra, Spain
14 May 165550.3AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
25 Jul 165651.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
28 Jan 166459.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cartagena (en España)
28 Aug 167267.6DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Mateo de Sagade de Bugueyro:
Archbishop Mateo de Sagade de Bugueyro (died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,096
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,636
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,843
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137, and Page 241
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 188, Number 1,179
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015