Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Aguirre y Gorozpe

Deceased

Bishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599¹Born
17 Nov 165960.8AppointedBishop of Durango, México
19 Dec 166061.9Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
21 Sep 167172.7DiedBishop of Durango, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Aguirre y Gorozpe
Bishop Juan Aguirre y Gorozpe (born 1599, died ) Bishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTecamachalco

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 179
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast