Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Alonso de Cuevas y Davalos

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1590BornMéxico
19 Jan 165867.2AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
13 Sep 165867.8Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
28 Apr 166473.4AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
15 Nov 166474.0InstalledArchbishop of México, Federal District
2 Sep 166574.8DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Juan Alonso de Cuevas y Davalos:
Archbishop Juan Alonso de Cuevas y Davalos (born , died ) Archbishop of México

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,431
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 85, and Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013