Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Barrientos Lomelin

Deceased

Bishop of Durango


Events

DateEventTitle
31 May 1655AppointedBishop of Durango, México
16 Jul 1656Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
27 Dec 1658³DiedBishop of Durango, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Barrientos Lomelin:
Bishop Pedro de Barrientos Lomelin (died ) Bishop of Durango

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 179
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015