Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Athanase Sabbagh

Deceased

Bishop of Akka (Melkite Greek), Israel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1862Born
18 Apr 189432.2AppointedBishop of Akka (Melkite Greek), Israel
29 Apr 189432.3Ordained BishopBishop of Akka (Melkite Greek), Israel
2 Jun 189937.4DiedBishop of Akka (Melkite Greek), Israel

MicroData Summary for Athanase Sabbagh
Bishop Athanase Sabbagh (born , died ) Bishop of Akka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlexandria
Ordained BishopCairo

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Jun 2017