Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastien de Lodron

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Feb 1630SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
26 Aug 1630ConfirmedBishop of Gurk, Austria
4 Sep 1643DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Sebastien de Lodron
Bishop Sebastien de Lodron (died ) Bishop of Gurk

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 200
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,630, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast