Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomasz Wieyski (Ujejski)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1612Born
3 Apr 165643.2AppointedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
22 Oct 165643.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
12 Jun 167966.4ResignedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
1 Aug 168976.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Tomasz Wieyski (Ujejski)
Bishop Tomasz Wieyski (Ujejski) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSandomir

  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 149
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 19
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast