Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wacław Leszczyński

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1605BornBaranˇw
163731.3Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
6 Apr 164438.6SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
12 Dec 164439.3ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
23 Apr 164539.6Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
27 Jan 165953.4AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
1 Apr 166660.6DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wacław Leszczyński:
Archbishop Wacław Leszczyński (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 195, and Page 359
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,943
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1645, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015