Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Watteville, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574Born
160329.0ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
10 Jun 160935.4AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
18 Apr 161036.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
22 Jul 164975.5DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jean de Watteville
Bishop Jean de Watteville O. Cist. (born 1574, died ) Bishop of Lausanne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourg-de-Sirod

  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast