Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Volturale

Deceased

Bishop of Vieste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1643³BornNapoli
14 Jan 169753.8AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
20 Jan 169753.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vieste, Italy
18 Oct 169754.5DiedBishop of Vieste, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Volturale:
Bishop Francesco Antonio Volturale (born , died ) Bishop of Vieste

  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 412
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015