Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Visdelou

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Feb 1651AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Quimper, France
27 Feb 1651AppointedTitular Bishop of Madaurus
7 May 1651Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Madaurus
12 Jan 1662SelectedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
27 Jul 1663ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
18 May 1668DiedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France

MicroData Summary for François de Visdelou:
Bishop François de Visdelou (died ) Bishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 228, and Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015