Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Coëtlogon-Méjusseaume

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1631BornSaint-Brieuc
1 Mar 166634.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Quimper, France
1 Mar 166634.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Madaurus
18 Apr 166634.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Madaurus
11 Feb 166836.6SucceededBishop of Quimper, France
6 Nov 170675.4DiedBishop of Quimper, France

MicroData Summary for François de Coëtlogon-Méjusseaume:
Bishop François de Coëtlogon-Méjusseaume (born , died ) Bishop of Quimper

  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 228
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015